U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Bell Contracting Inc v. Central Texas Express Metal Work LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.