U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00496
  • Case Name: TNT Crane and Rigging Inc v. Total Demolitions Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 03, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.