U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 11, 2025: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.