U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiggins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Letter - Record Sent to USCA]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.