U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serrato Aguero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Joint Discovery Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.