U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01303
  • Case Name: TC et al v. Chattanooga Public School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.