U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Brown v. Institution
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 25, 2025: [Receipt]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.