U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roof
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 11, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 21, 2025: [Joint Discovery Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.