U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00370-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dawkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.