U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Six v. Vermillion et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.