U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Womble Company The v. Lujan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.