U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00284
  • Case Name: Weese v. Allstate Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.