U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver (other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Other Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Advisement to Court - Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.