U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10418
  • Case Name: Danielle Odette Munoz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Interim Report (trustee)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Notice to File Claims]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Request for Notice to File Claims (trustee)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Interim Report (trustee)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Chapter 7 Initial Report]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors Continued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.