U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10033
  • Case Name: Serena Narada Glover
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Reaffirmation Agreement Approving/Denying]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Reaffirmation Agreement Approving/Denying]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Reaffirmation Agreement Note - Chambers]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Notice of Deficiency (Reaffirmation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.