U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10814
  • Case Name: Kenneth Francis Morrow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Text Order Striking Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Objection to Claim (trustee)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [COS - Certificate or Affidavit of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [No Money at Case Filing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.