U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10361
  • Case Name: Erika Anne Hare
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Minute Entry - Hearing Continued CHAP]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Order on Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing - Chp 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (multi)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Objection to Confirmation and Request for Hearing - batch (trustee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.