U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10490
  • Case Name: Travis Dewayne Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing - Chp 13]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Objection to Confirmation and Request for Hearing - batch (trustee)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (multi)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Intent to Pay Claims (trustee)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Missing Signature (bk)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.