U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10835
  • Case Name: Sabrina Nicole Wright
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay the Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay the Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [No Money at Case Filing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.