U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10191-T
  • Case Name: Emily Anne Landry and Emily Marie Price
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Financial Management Course Notification]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management Course Due (Chapter 7)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Employ]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice (ADI Only)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Employ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Notice to File Claims]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.