U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01074
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Teekell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.