U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10400-T
  • Case Name: Beverly Leeann Woodward
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Payment Advices Certification]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Financial Management ADI Only]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Payment Advices]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122A-1/Exemption Presumption of Abuse - Form 122A-1Supp]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.