U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10845
  • Case Name: Waylen G Brown and Amy BROWN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [2 Relief from Stay and to Abandon or Adequate Protection]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Relief from Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [2 Relief from Stay and to Abandon or Adequate Protection]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.