U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80212
  • Case Name: James Braxton Mize and Melanie June Mize
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Report of No Distribution-No Funds (Batch)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Relief from Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [3-Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (ADI)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.