U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10035-T
  • Case Name: Ernesto Munoz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management ADI Only]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Financial Management Course Notification]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Financial Management Course Due (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.