U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80222
  • Case Name: Christopher Sidney Everett Mabala and Mandilyn Rene Mabala
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Report of No Distribution-No Funds (Batch)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Abandon]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Relief from Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [4-Abandon]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [3-Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.