U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10898
  • Case Name: Cassie Ann Batson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Dismissing Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Show Cause]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Documents Past Due]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Dropbox/EDSS/eSR Notes]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [No Money at Case Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.