U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10916
  • Case Name: Kara Raquel-Elaine Williams and Christopher Steven Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Notice of Intent to Pay Claims (trustee)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.