U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bueso-Maldonado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 25, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Interpreter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oath of Interpreter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [DPPA-Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Interpreter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Oath of Interpreter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.