U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80242
  • Case Name: Gayla Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Report of No Distribution-dismissed or converted, no funds (Batch)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Court's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Dismissing Case]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Send Document to BNC]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (ADI)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homen,, Trustee Luke [Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.