U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10010-T
  • Case Name: Alexis Paige Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Final Decree. Case Closed.]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Request for Entry of Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Soule', Steven William [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.