U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10940
  • Case Name: Jacob M. Perkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Notice of Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Statement of Declination]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moriarty, Stephen J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.