U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10447
  • Case Name: TRACI K GOUDEAU
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Financial Management ADI Only]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Payment Advices]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Verification of Creditor List]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.