U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10963
  • Case Name: Anas Juma Milbes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Dismissing Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [miscellaneous relief]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Show Cause]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [miscellaneous relief]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [CCC - Credit Counseling not filed]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.