U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10972
  • Case Name: Brandon Henry Lewis Herron and Jamie Michelle Herron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Notice of Deficiency (Reaffirmation)]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Incomplete PDF Image (bk)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.