U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10964
  • Case Name: Cody Dale Aebischer and Laura Renee Aebischer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Chapter 7 Initial Report]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Notice to File Claims]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Interim Report (trustee)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Request for Notice to File Claims (trustee)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Avoid Lien]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Correct Hearing Information]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [COS - Certificate or Affidavit of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Missing Signature (bk)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Avoid Lien]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.