U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11020
  • Case Name: Robert Glen Gibbons, Jr. and Kimberly Sue Gibbons
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Determine Value of Claim/Property]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Incomplete PDF Image (bk)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Required Documents not filed with Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.