U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11030
  • Case Name: Mariah S McKay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Chapter 7 Initial Report]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Notice of Case Reassignment]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Minute Order Requesting Case Reassignment]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.