U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10829
  • Case Name: Joshua Teeter and Bryana Teeter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Interim Report (trustee)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Notice to File Claims]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Withdrawal of Trustee's Report of No Distribution (trustee)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Request for Notice to File Claims (trustee)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Notice Appointing Trustee (No 341 Hearing chp 7) (multi)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Reopen Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Reopen Bankruptcy Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.