U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11087
  • Case Name: David Carlton Nation and Cleo Suzann Nation
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Incomplete PDF Image (bk)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.