U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11099
  • Case Name: Christopher Michael Waggoner and Kacie Lynn Waggoner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Pay Trustee]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Link]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Selected Event does not match PDF image]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Verify Case - Chapter 13]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.