U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11120
  • Case Name: Levi Richard Boggs
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Documents Past Due]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Minute Entry - CHAP]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Dropdown Prefix Box]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [FMC (Financial Management Course) dates]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Continuation / Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.