U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11166
  • Case Name: Keava Garrett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Court Correction]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Incomplete PDF Image (bk)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [No Money at Case Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: George, Lysbeth L [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.