U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00247-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 05, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [DPPA-Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.