U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00275-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Romero Barajas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 05, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [DPPA-Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Oath of Interpreter]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Interpreter - Out of Court Interpretive Services]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Interpreter - In Court Interpretive Services]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Interpreter - In Court Interpretive Services]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Interpreter - Out of Court Interpretive Services]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.