U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01928
  • Case Name: Friends of Animals v. Morrison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Administrative Record]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Lodging of the Administrative Record]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.