U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Zakarneh v. Immigration Custom Enforcement et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Electronically Transferred Out to Another District]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.