U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01554
  • Case Name: Sample et al v. Legacy Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Findings & Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.