U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00849
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Powell Water Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.