U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Ringer v. Carruth Compliance Consulting, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.